US SB4148 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program until July 27, 2023.
Title
A bill to extend the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-07-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-20 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3109) |
2020-07-20 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3109) |
2020-07-20 | House | Ms. Titus asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2020-07-06 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-07-06 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4163; text: CR S4163) |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
HB6160 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
SB4096 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6160 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
SB4096 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism