US SB4200 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the General Service Administration (GSA) to establish an Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program to facilitate the adoption of modern technology by executive agencies. The bill lists program responsibilities, including to modernize information technology used by an executive agency and how a customer interacts with the agency; improve cooperation between commercial and executive agency information technology sectors; encourage the adoption of commercial items; and assist executive agencies, on a reimbursable basis, with planning and adoption of technology in focus areas designated by the GSA, which may include, among other things, artificial intelligence. The GSA, for each reimbursable agreement entered into, shall make specified information available on a public website within 30 days of the signing of the agreement and updated upon completion. shall sunset seven years after its enactment.
Title
Information Technology Modernization Centers of Excellence Program Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-277. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5901 (Related) 2020-12-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-194. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government operations and politics
Infrastructure development
Public-private cooperation
Computers and information technology
Executive agency funding and structure
General Services Administration
Government operations and politics
Infrastructure development
Public-private cooperation