US SB4209 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Became Public Law No: 116-151. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020 This bill permits certain governmental entities, federally recognized tribes, and nonprofit organizations to make up front payments of 50% of unemployment benefits into the state Unemployment Trust Fund (in lieu of contributions) to be used exclusively to reduce such payments resulting from the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic. Currently, the Department of Labor issued guidance on April 27, 2020 (UIPL 18-20), requiring states to collect 100% of such payments up front and then reimburse them by 50% later. In addition, the bill allows states to opt to issue such reimbursements or to reduce the amounts required to be paid for weeks of employment after March 12, 2020, and before enactment of this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Nonprofits from Catastrophic Cash Flow Strain Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-151. (TXT | PDF)
2020-08-03HouseSigned by President.
2020-07-22HousePresented to President.
2020-07-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-07-09HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H3071)
2020-07-09HouseWithout objection, the Chair laid before the House S. 4209. (consideration: CR H3071)
2020-07-06HouseHeld at the desk.
2020-07-06HouseReceived in the House.
2020-07-02SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-07-02SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4240; text: CR S4240)

Same As/Similar To

SB4001 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback