US SB4210 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Homeland Security to transfer personal protective equipment or medically necessary equipment to the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) during a declared public health emergency. These transfers must be made at the request of HHS and on a reimbursable basis.
Title
Securing Healthcare and Response Equipment Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 624. |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-321. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4204 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 573.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Public contracts and procurement
Worker safety and health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Public contracts and procurement
Worker safety and health