US SB4212 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 504.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 504.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 28, United States Code, to strip foreign sovereign immunity of certain foreign states to secure justice for victims of novel coronavirus in the United States.
Title
Civil Justice for Victims of COVID Act Civil Justice for Victims of China-Originated Viral Infections Diseases Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 504. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3674 (Related) 2020-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7818 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7818 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Civil actions and liability
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government liability
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
State and local government operations
Civil actions and liability
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government liability
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Jurisdiction and venue
Law
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
State and local government operations