US SB4220 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Introduced on July 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing Authoritarian Policing Tactics on America's Streets Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing Authoritarian Policing Tactics on America's Streets Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-20SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HB7153 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3909 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7719 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback