US SB4222 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires federal agencies to report to the Government Accountability Office certain information about agency rules that are made ineffective due to an agency action or other reason.
Title
GAO Database Modernization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7828-7829; text: CR S7829) |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-298. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations