US SB426 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases by 3.6% in FY2020 the rates of basic pay for federal employees under the statutory pay systems (i.e., the General Schedule, the Foreign Service Schedule, and various schedules related to the Veterans Health Administration) and for prevailing rate employees.
Title
FAIR Act Federal Adjustment of Income Rates Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
HB1073 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3231 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB790 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Received in the Senate.
HB1073 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB262 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3231 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/426/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s426/BILLS-116s426is.pdf |