US SB4263 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3-1)
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Voting Rights Act of 1965 to revise the criteria for determining which States and political subdivisions are subject to section 4 of the Act, and for other purposes.
Title
John Lewis Voting Rights Advancement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 107, enrollment corrections on H.R. 4 have been made.
HCR107 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Received in the Senate.
SB561 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HCR107 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Received in the Senate.
SB561 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal-Indian relations
Government operations and politics
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal-Indian relations
Government operations and politics
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4263/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4263/BILLS-116s4263is.pdf |