US SB43 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Forest Service, upon request by Fannin County in Texas, to convey approximately 2,025 acres of National Forest System land to the county.
Title
Lake Fannin Recreation Area Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB343 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB343 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Texas
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/43/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s43/BILLS-116s43is.pdf |