US SB430 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Intermediate-Range Nuclear Forces (INF) Treaty Preservation Act of 2017 This bill states that it is the policy of the United States that: (1) Russian actions undertaken in violation of the the Treaty between the United States of America and the Union of Soviet Socialist Republics on the Elimination of their Intermediate-Range and Shorter-Range Missiles (INF treaty) constitute a material breach of the treaty, (2) the United States is legally entitled to suspend the INF treaty in whole or in part for so long as Russia continues to be in material breach, and (3) the United States should take certain actions to bring the Russian Federation back into compliance. The bill authorizes additional appropriations for: (1) development of active defenses to counter ground launched missile systems; (2) counterforce and countervailing capabilities; (3) missile system transfers to allied countries; and (4) research, development, and evaluation activities for a dual-capable road-mobile ground-launched cruise missile system. The Department of Defense (DOD) shall: (1) develop such a system with a range of between 500 to 5,500 kilometers; (2) report on the cost, schedule, and feasibility to modify the Tomahawk, Standard Missile-3, Standard Missile-6, Long-Range Stand Off Cruise Missile, and Army Tactical Missile System missiles for ground-launch with such range; and (3) report on the number and location of AEGIS Ashore sites with anti-air warfare capability necessary in Asia and Europe to defend U.S. forces and allies from Russian ground launched missile systems. The Director of National Intelligence, every 90 days for five years, shall determine whether Russia has flight tested, produced, or possesses a system that is inconsistent with the INF treaty and that has reached initial operational capability, is deployed, or is about to be deployed. No funds may be obligated or expended to extend the New START Treaty, permit Russian flights over the United States or U.S. allies pursuant to the Open Skies Treaty, or permit the approval of new or updated implementation decisions through the Open Skies Consultative Commission unless the President certifies that Russia has eliminated all missiles that are in violation of, or that may be inconsistent with, the INF treaty. The Department of State shall conduct a review of the RS-26 Ballistic Missile system. Upon a determination that Russia has flight-tested, produced, or is in possession of certain missiles, the President shall: (1) suspend the application of the INF treaty with respect to the United States, and (2) notify the other state parties to the INF treaty that Russia is in material breach of the INF treaty and of the U.S. decision to suspend the INF treaty.
Title
Intermediate-Range Nuclear Forces (INF) Treaty Preservation Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1182 (Related) 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alliances
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Europe
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International law and treaties
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Russia
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Europe
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International law and treaties
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Russia