US SB4318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

American Workers, Families, and Employers Assistance Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Workers, Families, and Employers Assistance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB4796 (Related) 2019-11-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB6781 (Related) 2020-05-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Small Business, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB604 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3638 (Related) 2020-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
SB3841 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Ordered held at desk by unanimous consent.
SB3995 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S3102-3104)
SB4214 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB7615 (Related) 2020-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB4268 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4275 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S4425-4426)
SB4244 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4378 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8056 (Related) 2020-08-14 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Adoption and foster care
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Appropriations
Business expenses
Business records
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Debt collection
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of the Treasury
Disability assistance
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee hiring
Employment taxes
Executive agency funding and structure
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Hospital care
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intergovernmental relations
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Internet and video services
Judicial procedure and administration
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Nursing
Poverty and welfare assistance
Rural conditions and development
Self-employed
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Small business
Social Security Administration
Social security and elderly assistance
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local courts
State and local finance
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Telephone and wireless communication
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback