US SB4322 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to help Americans safely get back to school and back to work, and for other purposes.
Title
Safely Back to School and Back to Work Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4063 (Related) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209)
SB4221 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4231 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4267-4270)
HB7731 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB4239 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4249 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7804 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8075 (Related) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB4221 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4231 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4267-4270)
HB7731 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SB4239 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4249 (Related) 2020-07-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB7804 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB8075 (Related) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Appropriations
Blood and blood diseases
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Immunology and vaccination
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Manufacturing
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Performance measurement
Product development and innovation
Property tax
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Strategic materials and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Temporary and part-time employment
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
Youth employment and child labor
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Appropriations
Blood and blood diseases
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Education
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability and health-based discrimination
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Food and Drug Administration (FDA)
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Immunology and vaccination
Income tax credits
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Manufacturing
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Performance measurement
Product development and innovation
Property tax
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Strategic materials and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Temporary and part-time employment
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
Youth employment and child labor
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4322/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4322/BILLS-116s4322is.pdf |