US SB4334 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to improve the process by which a member of the Armed Forces may be referred for a mental health evaluation.
Title
Brandon Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7368 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3045-3046)
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7368 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3045-3046)
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4334/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4334/BILLS-116s4334is.pdf |