US SB4384 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into an agreement with the Agency for Toxic Substances and Disease Registry to complete a study to identify and assess any causation or correlation between exposure to toxicants at the Karshi-Khanabad (K2) Air Base in Uzbekistan between October 7, 2001, and November 21, 2005, and incidents of cancer or other diseases in members of the Armed Forces. The bill also expands the definition of an open burn pit, for purposes of the VA's open burn pit registry, to include burn pits located on land in Uzbekistan. A burn pit is an area used for burning solid waste in open air without equipment.
Title
K2 Veterans Advocacy Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 546. |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Fires
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Solid waste and recycling
Uzbekistan
Veterans' medical care
Asia
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Fires
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Solid waste and recycling
Uzbekistan
Veterans' medical care