US SB4395 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the U.S. Maritime Administration (MARAD) to provide financial assistance to states and maritime industry entities during an emergency such as COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, MARAD may provide grants for operating costs involved with an emergency response operation, including costs for cleaning, sanitizing, janitorial services, staffing, paid leave, and procuring personal protective equipment; and the costs of capital projects to protect, repair, reconstruct, or replace equipment and facilities of the United States maritime transportation system that are in danger of suffering serious damage, or has suffered serious damage, as a result of an emergency. The federal share payable of the costs for which a grant is provided under the bill shall be 100%.
Title
Maritime Transportation System Emergency Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7515 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Marine and inland water transportation
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Worker safety and health
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Marine and inland water transportation
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Natural disasters
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Public contracts and procurement
State and local government operations
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4395/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4395/BILLS-116s4395is.pdf |