US SB4429 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the exposure of members of the Armed Forces to toxic substances at Karshi-Khanabad (K2) Air Base in Uzbekistan between October 1, 2001, and December 31, 2005. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of Defense (DOD) to study and report on the exposure of members of the Armed Forces to toxic substances at K2 Air Base during the specified period. The bill also expands the definition of an open burn pit, for purposes of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) open burn pit registry, to include burn pits located on land in Uzbekistan. A burn pit is an area used for burning solid waste in open air without equipment. DOD and the VA must ensure that individuals deployed to K2 Air Base during the specified time period are covered by the Depleted Uranium Follow-Up Programs of the departments. Such programs study the health effects of depleted uranium exposure and provide treatment. Upon request by the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine, DOD and the VA must provide information for the performance of a study on the exposure of humans to toxic substances at K2 Air Base during the specified period.
Title
K2 Veterans Toxic Exposure Accountability Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5957 (Related) 2020-02-25 - Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Fires
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Solid waste and recycling
Uzbekistan
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Asia
Congressional oversight
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental health
Fires
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Solid waste and recycling
Uzbekistan
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4429/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4429/BILLS-116s4429is.pdf |