US SB4433 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources by unanimous consent.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources by unanimous consent.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the National Medal of Honor Museum Foundation to establish a commemorative work on federal land in the District of Columbia in honor of the extraordinary acts of valor, selfless service, and sacrifice displayed by Medal of Honor recipients. The foundation shall be solely responsible for the acceptance of contributions for, and the payment of expenses of, the establishment of the commemorative work. Federal funds may not be used to pay any expenses for the establishment of the commemorative work.
Title
National Medal of Honor Monument Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources by unanimous consent. |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5173 (Related) 2019-12-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB8752 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB8752 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Government trust funds
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Congressional tributes
District of Columbia
Government trust funds
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4433/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4433/BILLS-116s4433is.pdf |