US SB4443 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to protect more victims of domestic violence by preventing their abusers from possessing or receiving firearms, and for other purposes.
Title
Lori Jackson Domestic Violence Survivor Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7930 (Same As) 2020-08-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
SB4271 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB2843 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6569)
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Firearms and explosives
Retail and wholesale trades
Child safety and welfare
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against children
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Domestic violence and child abuse
Evidence and witnesses
Family relationships
Firearms and explosives
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4443/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4443/BILLS-116s4443is.pdf |