US SB4460 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs to waive existing eligibility requirements for a veteran to receive per diem payments for domiciliary care at a state home if the veteran has met at least four of such requirements (e.g., can feed himself or herself), or the waiver would be in the best interest of the veteran. A state home is a home established by a state for veterans disabled by age, disease, or otherwise and who are incapable of earning a living because of such disability. The term also includes a home that furnishes nursing home care for veterans.
Title
State Veterans Homes Domiciliary Care Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7286) |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7286) |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4944-4945) |
Same As/Similar To
HB8076 (Same As) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
HB7105 (Related) 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-315.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation