US SB450 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the administration of the hiring process for Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) personnel. Specifically, the bill requires the VA to publish on a VA website specified information related to the duration of the hiring process for certain health care appointees, such as physicians. The VA Office of Inspector General must review the administration of such website annually, instead of the current semiannual requirement. Lastly, the bill requires the VA to include in its annual hiring report the steps it is taking to improve the onboarding timeline at facilities where the duration of the process exceeds suggested metrics.
Title
Veterans Improved Access and Care Act of 2019 Veterans Improved Access and Care Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 412. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1674 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Health personnel
Licensing and registrations
Veterans' medical care