US SB4612 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates methamphetamine as an emerging drug threat (a new and growing trend in the use of an illicit drug or class of drug). It also directs the Office of National Drug Control Policy to implement a methamphetamine response plan.
Title
Methamphetamine Response Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-17 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6716-6717) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6716-6717) |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4491 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5284)
HB8210 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
HB8210 (Same As) 2020-09-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.