US SB4653 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 43. Record Vote Number: 200. (CR S6015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 43. Record Vote Number: 200. (CR S6015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to protect the healthcare of hundreds of millions of people of the United States and prevent efforts of the Department of Justice to advocate courts to strike down the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
A bill to protect the healthcare of hundreds of millions of people of the United States and prevent efforts of the Department of Justice to advocate courts to strike down the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure RC# 200 (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 43. Record Vote Number: 200. (CR S6015) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S5890) |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S5890) |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 551. |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (text: CR S5791) |
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Department of Justice
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Judicial review and appeals
Department of Justice
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Judicial review and appeals