US SB466 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Americans with Pre-existing Conditions Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Americans with Pre-existing Conditions Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB986 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90.
HB1884 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR357 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback