US SB4714 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5869-5874)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5869-5874)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to preserve health benefits for workers.
Title
Worker Health Coverage Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] |
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5869-5874) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4329 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6514 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB4329 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6514 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Appropriations
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Disability assistance
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Employment taxes
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Medicare
Religion
Social security and elderly assistance
Unemployment
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Disability assistance
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Employment taxes
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Medicare
Religion
Social security and elderly assistance
Unemployment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4714/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4714/BILLS-116s4714is.pdf |