US SB4732 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5874-5875)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5874-5875)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the National Science Foundation to contract with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine to study disinformation and misinformation about COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) on the internet and social media platforms.
Title
COVID–19 Disinformation Research and Reporting Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5874-5875) |
Same As/Similar To
HB8395 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Medical research
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Medical research
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4732/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4732/BILLS-116s4732is.pdf |