US SB4774 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide support for air carrier workers, and for other purposes.
Title
Air Carrier Worker Support Extension Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4634 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB8345 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB8504 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB8345 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB8504 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Subjects
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Labor-management relations
Rural conditions and development
Securities
Small towns
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Labor-management relations
Rural conditions and development
Securities
Small towns
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4774/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4774/BILLS-116s4774pcs.pdf |