US SB482 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Defending American Security from Kremlin Aggression Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defending American Security from Kremlin Aggression Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HB2159 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB1328 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1321 (Related) 2019-05-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 95.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Alliances
Arab-Israeli relations
Arms control and nonproliferation
Asia
Border security and unlawful immigration
Chemical and biological weapons
Civil actions and liability
Collective security
Computer security and identity theft
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Crime prevention
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Department of State
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic performance and conditions
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Employee hiring
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Georgia (Republic)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
Infrastructure development
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Iran
Israel
Judicial review and appeals
Lawyers and legal services
Lebanon
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military command and structure
Moldova
Navigation, waterways, harbors
News media and reporting
Nuclear power
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Political parties and affiliation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Protest and dissent
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Senate
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Television and film
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Travel and tourism
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine
United Nations
Voting rights
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback