US SB4825 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6378-6379)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6378-6379)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that vaccines for COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) that are authorized for emergency use must be covered under Medicare without cost-sharing. The bill applies retroactively.
Title
Ensuring Access to COVID–19 Vaccines for Seniors Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S6378-6379) |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8623 (Related) 2020-10-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8623 (Related) 2020-10-16 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care coverage and access
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicare
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care coverage and access
Immunology and vaccination
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4825/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4825/BILLS-116s4825is.pdf |