US SB483 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pesticide Registration Improvement Extension Act of 2018 This bill enacts into law the Pesticide Registration Improvement Extension Act of 2018 (115HR1029) from the 115th Congress, as passed by the Senate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticide Registration Improvement Extension Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-8.
2019-03-08HouseSigned by President.
2019-03-06HousePresented to President.
2019-03-04HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-02-28HouseSenate agreed to the House amendment to S.483 by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1606)
2019-02-28HouseMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
2019-02-26HouseMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
2019-02-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-25HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2068-2087)
2019-02-25HouseH.Amdt.43 On agreeing to the Peterson amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-25HouseH.Amdt.43 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Peterson. (consideration: CR H2068-2087; text: CR H2068-2087)
2019-02-25HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2068-2087)
2019-02-25HouseMr. Peterson asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
2019-02-15HouseHeld at the desk.
2019-02-15HouseMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-02-15HouseReceived in the House.
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1394; text: CR S1394)
2019-02-14SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 26.
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.

Same As/Similar To

HB1029 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback