US SB4857 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-18 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 275 Penn Avenue in Salem, Ohio, as the "Howard Arthur Tibbs Post Office."
Title
A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 275 Penn Avenue in Salem, Ohio, as the "Howard Arthur Tibbs Post Office".
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-18 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-18 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7644) |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7643-7644) |
2020-10-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8692 (Same As) 2020-10-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Ohio
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Ohio
Postal service