US SB488 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-16-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a new criminal civil rights violation for lynching. Specifically, a person who conspires to commit certain civil rights offenses (e.g., a hate crime act) is subject to criminal penalties.
Title
Justice for Victims of Lynching Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-02-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1346-1347; text: CR S1347) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3536 (Same As) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB35 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate.
HB7120 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3912 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB35 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate.
HB7120 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 490.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
HR1017 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB3912 (Related) 2020-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.