US SB490 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-167. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-167. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the mountain ridge that runs south and west of Emigrant Peak in the Absaroka Range in Montana, which is where an Air Force B-47 strategic bomber crashed while on a training mission in 1962, as the "B-47 Ridge." The bill permits the installing of a plaque on the ridge in memory of such crash.
Title
B-47 Ridge Designation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-167. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2020-09-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4568) |
2020-09-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 490. |
2020-09-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4568) |
2020-09-21 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2020-02-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1045; text: CR S1045) |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 343. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1267 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 403.
Subjects
Accidents
Aviation and airports
Military personnel and dependents
Montana
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources
Aviation and airports
Military personnel and dependents
Montana
Monuments and memorials
Public lands and natural resources