US SB50 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-99. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-99. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA) to assess sanitation and safety conditions on land set aside to provide Columbia River Treaty tribes access to traditional fishing grounds. The bill applies to land held by the United States for the benefit of the Nez Perce Tribe, the Confederated Tribes of Umatilla Indian Reservation, the Confederated Tribes of the Warm Springs Reservation of Oregon, and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation. The BIA may enter into contracts with tribes or tribal organizations to improve sanitation, safety conditions, and access to electricity, sewer, and water infrastructure on this land. The Government Accountability Office must evaluate whether the sanitation and safety conditions on the lands have improved as a result of the contracts and report on the results of the evaluation.
Title
Columbia River In-Lieu and Treaty Fishing Access Sites Improvement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 116-99. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10301) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 50. |
2019-12-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10301-10302) |
2019-12-16 | House | Ms. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-28 | House | Held at the desk. |
2019-06-28 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4649) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.904 Amendment SA 904 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | S.Amdt.904 Amendment SA 904 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Hoeven. (consideration: CR S4649; text: CR S4649) To amend the authorization amount. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4649) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 38. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-7. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB91 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
Oregon
Solid waste and recycling
Washington State
Water quality
Water use and supply
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Native Americans
Oregon
Solid waste and recycling
Washington State
Water quality
Water use and supply