US SB514 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-12-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Deborah Sampson Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deborah Sampson Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 536.
2020-09-15SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
2020-08-05SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-22SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2019-02-14SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3636 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2681 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB2972 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3189 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback