US SB515 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several tax provisions that refer to married couples to make the provisions equally applicable to legally married same-sex couples.
Title
Equal Dignity for Married Taxpayers Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1244 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3294 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
HB1940 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1940 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3294 (Related) 2019-06-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3299 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
HB1940 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1940 (Related) 2019-06-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Marriage and family status
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/515/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s515/BILLS-116s515is.pdf |