US SB518 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small and Rural Community Clean Water Technical Assistance Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to authorize the Environmental Protection Agency to provide grants or cooperative agreements to qualified technical assistance providers for assisting small or medium publicly owned treatment works (POTWs) in complying with the Act or obtaining financing under the Act for eligible projects. Small POTWs serve 10,000 individuals or fewer and medium POTWs serve from 10,001 to 75,000 individuals. States may use an additional 2% of their clean water state revolving fund allocation grants to provide technical assistance to small or medium POTWs.
Title
Small and Rural Community Clean Water Technical Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] |
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 89. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-71. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Fisheries, Water, and Wildlife. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-12. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5030 (Related) 2018-02-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
SB2800 (Related) 2018-07-10 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-294.
Subjects
Environmental protection
Government lending and loan guarantees
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply
Government lending and loan guarantees
Rural conditions and development
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
State and local finance
Water quality
Water use and supply