US SB52 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes additional sanctions and financial restrictions on institutions and individuals related to the conflict in Syria. The Department of the Treasury shall determine whether the Central Bank of Syria is a financial institution of primary money laundering concern. If so, Treasury shall impose one or more special measures, such as requiring domestic financial institutions to maintain additional records on transactions involving the bank. The President shall impose sanctions on foreign persons that (1) provide significant support or engage in a significant transaction with the Syrian government or those acting on behalf of Syria, Russia, or Iran; or (2) are knowingly responsible for serious human rights abuses against the Syrian people. The bill also imposes sanctions on those that knowingly provide various goods or services to Syria, such as aircraft for the military, technology for the government's domestic petroleum production, items on the U.S. Munitions List, and items that the President believes are being used to commit human rights abuses against the Syrian people. The sanctions include blocking of financial transactions and barring of entry into the United States. Such sanctions shall not apply to activities related to providing humanitarian aid or supporting democratic institutions in Syria. The President may suspend the sanctions under certain conditions, including if it is in the United States' national security interests. The Department of State is authorized to assist entities that are conducting criminal investigations and gathering evidence to prosecute those responsible for war crimes in Syria.
Title
Caesar Syria Civilian Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held. |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB31 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 107.
SB1 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Held at the desk.
HB336 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB1 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Held at the desk.
HB336 (Similar To) 2019-02-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Arms control and nonproliferation
Aviation and airports
Chemical and biological weapons
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Aviation and airports
Chemical and biological weapons
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Evidence and witnesses
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Health facilities and institutions
Human rights
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Iran
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Nuclear weapons
Oil and gas
Reconstruction and stabilization
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sanctions
Syria
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
United Nations
Visas and passports
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/52/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s52/BILLS-116s52is.pdf |