US SB520 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Energy to establish and report on a pilot program to award grants for providing nonprofit buildings with energy-efficiency materials.
Title
A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to establish an energy efficiency materials pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 174. |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment. With written report No. 116-72. |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3120 (Related) 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Subjects
Building construction
Educational facilities and institutions
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Health facilities and institutions
Materials
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Educational facilities and institutions
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Health facilities and institutions
Materials
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations