US SB530 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1543-1544)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1543-1544)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to limit, after June 30, 2011, the eligibility for the income and excise tax credits for alcohol used as fuel to ethanol that qualifies as an advanced biofuel under the Clean Air Act. Requires the President to: (1) reduce semiannually the temporary duty imposed on ethanol by an amount equal to the reduction in any federal income or excise tax credit for alcohol and ethanol blends used as fuel; and (2) take other actions necessary to ensure that the combined temporary duty and any other duty imposed on ethanol is equal to, or lower than, any federal income or excise tax credit applicable to ethanol.
Title
A bill to modify certain subsidies for ethanol production, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jim Webb [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1543-1544) |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR 3/10/2011 S1544) |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/530/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s530/BILLS-112s530is.pdf |