US SB555 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll in the Marshall Islands between January 1, 1977, and December 31, 1980, as radiation-exposed veterans for purposes of the Department of Veterans Affairs presumption of service-connection for specified cancers. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific diseases diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded.
Title
Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1377 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/555/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s555/BILLS-116s555is.pdf |