US SB561 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Voting Rights Act of 1965 to revise the criteria for determining which States and political subdivisions are subject to section 4 of the Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Voting Rights Advancement Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 107, enrollment corrections on H.R. 4 have been made.
HB1799 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR741 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HCR107 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Received in the Senate.
SB4263 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1799 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HR741 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HCR107 (Similar To) 2020-07-29 - Received in the Senate.
SB4263 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal-Indian relations
Government operations and politics
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Federal-Indian relations
Government operations and politics
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Racial and ethnic relations
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/561/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s561/BILLS-116s561is.pdf |