US SB590 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-25-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hidden Figures Congressional Gold Medal Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hidden Figures Congressional Gold Medal Act

Sponsors

Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN]Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC]
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC]Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]
Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS]
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-29HouseReceived in the House.
2019-03-28SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-03-27SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2061-2062)
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2061-2062)
2019-02-27SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1396 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E284)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback