US SB593 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-372. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-15 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-372. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act This bill amends the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act to facilitate the construction and expansion of public target ranges by: (1) authorizing a state to pay up to 90% of the costs of acquiring land for, expanding, or constructing a public target range; (2) authorizing a state to elect to allocate 10% of a specified amount apportioned to it from the federal aid to wildlife restoration fund for those costs; (3) limiting the federal share of those costs under such Act to 90%; and (4) requiring amounts provided for those costs under such Act to remain available for expenditure and obligation for five fiscal years. The United States shall be shielded from any civil action or claim for money damages for injury to or loss of property, personal injury, or death caused by an activity occurring at a public target range that is funded by the federal government pursuant to such Act or located on federal land, except to the extent provided under the Federal Tort Claims Act with respect to the exercise or performance of a discretionary function. The bill urges the Forest Service and the Bureau of Land Management to cooperate with state and local authorities and other entities to carry out waste removal and other activities on any federal land used as a public target range to encourage its continued use for target practice or marksmanship training.
Title
Target Practice and Marksmanship Training Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Heidi Heitkamp [D-ND] |
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Luther Strange [R-AL] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 115-372. Additional views filed. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 575. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB788 (Same As) 2018-05-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 546.
SB1514 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
SB1514 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
Subjects
Firearms and explosives
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government liability
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Solid waste and recycling
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection