US SB617 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Tax Extender and Disaster Relief Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Extender and Disaster Relief Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1595-1599)

Same As/Similar To

HB510 (Related) 2019-01-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1974 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1977 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2059 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2089 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2137 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2193 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1133 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2284 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1141 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2145 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects

Alternative and renewable resources
American Samoa
Business expenses
Business investment and capital
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Charitable contributions
Coal
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee benefits and pensions
Energy efficiency and conservation
First responders and emergency personnel
Government trust funds
Guam
Health care costs and insurance
Housing finance and home ownership
Hybrid, electric, and advanced technology vehicles
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Life, casualty, property insurance
Mammals
Mining
Minority employment
Motor fuels
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Oil and gas
Pollution liability
Poverty and welfare assistance
Professional sports
Public utilities and utility rates
Railroads
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Sales and excise taxes
Sports and recreation facilities
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Television and film
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback