US SB633 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to arrange for the award of a Congressional Gold Medal in honor of the women of the 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion (commonly known as the "Six Triple Eight") in recognition of their pioneering military service, devotion to duty, and contributions to increase the morale of personnel stationed in the European theater of operations during World War II. The medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution and made available for display and research.
Title
"Six Triple Eight" Congressional Gold Medal Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7430-7431) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.2702 Amendment SA 2702 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | S.Amdt.2702 Amendment SA 2702 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S7430-7431; text: CR S7430-7431) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7430-7431) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3138 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Postal service
Smithsonian Institution
Women's employment
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Europe
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Minority employment
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Postal service
Smithsonian Institution
Women's employment