US SB645 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public secondary school with a Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps unit to allow homeschooled students to join the unit.
Title
A bill to amend title 10, United States Code, to provide for the inclusion of homeschooled students in Junior Reserve Officer's Training Corps units.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1258 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Military education and training
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Military education and training
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/645/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s645/BILLS-116s645is.pdf |