US SB652 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-71. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-18 - Became Public Law No: 115-71. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to revise programs for deaf and hard-of-hearing newborns and infants, including to expand the programs to include young children. The programs are reauthorized through FY2022. Health Resources and Services Administration support for the education and training of personnel and health care providers for such programs is expanded to include education and training of family members.
Title
Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] |
Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-71. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-10-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2017-10-06 | House | Presented to President. |
2017-10-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7694-7696) |
2017-10-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 652. |
2017-10-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7694-7698) |
2017-10-03 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-09-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-09-07 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5017-5018; text: CR S5017-5018) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 44. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1539 (Related) 2017-03-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Child health
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
Surgery and anesthesia
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Research administration and funding
Surgery and anesthesia