US SB675 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Long Island Sound Restoration and Stewardship Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to direct the Office of the Management Conference of the Long Island Sound Study within the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to include in studies on strengthening the implementation of the Comprehensive Conservation and Management Plan for Long Island Sound: (1) environmental impacts on the sound watershed; and (2) planning initiatives that identify areas most suitable for various activities in order to reduce conflicts among uses, reduce adverse environmental impacts, facilitate compatible uses, or preserve critical ecosystem services. The office must: (1) develop and implement strategies to increase education and awareness about the ecological health and water quality of the sound; and (2) monitor progress toward meeting the goals, actions, and schedules of the plan. Grants in support of the plan (other than citizen involvement and education grants) must not exceed 60% (currently 50%) of the cost of research, studies, or work. The bill establishes a biennial reporting requirement with respect to the office's implementation of the plan. In addition, the President's annual budget must include information about the involvement of each federal department and agency in the protection and restoration of the Long Island Sound watershed, including an interagency crosscut budget and a summary of proposed modifications to the plan for the following year. The EPA must coordinate the actions of all federal departments and agencies that impact water quality in the Long Island Sound watershed to improve the water quality and living resources of the watershed. A federal agency that owns or occupies real property, or carries out activities, within the sound watershed must: (1) participate in regional and subwatershed planning, protection, and restoration activities; and (2) ensure that the property and activities are consistent with the plan to the maximum extent practicable. The bill: (1) extends the Long Island Sound Stewardship Advisory Committee through 2023, and (2) exempts the committee from requirements of the Federal Advisory Committee Act. (Sec. 3) The bill reauthorizes the Management Conference of the Long Island Sound Study, the Long Island Sound Stewardship Act of 2006, the Long Island Sound Grants, and Long Island Sound Stewardship Grants through FY2023.
Title
Long Island Sound Restoration and Stewardship Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 115-72. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Fisheries, Water, and Wildlife. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-12. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1674 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Long Island Sound
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New York State
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Connecticut
Ecology
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Long Island Sound
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New York State
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection