US SB686 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1386-1387)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1386-1387)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a limitation on certain aliens from claiming the earned income tax credit. This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to deny the earned income tax credit to an alien who has been granted deferred action from removal in any taxable year in which such alien was not lawfully present in the United States or not authorized to work. The bill requires the Commissioner of Social Security to provide the Internal Revenue Service with information on social security account numbers granted to aliens under the deferred action from removal program.
Title
A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a limitation on certain aliens from claiming the earned income tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Daniel Coats [R-IN] | Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1386-1387) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1182 (Related) 2015-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1249 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2389 (Related) 2015-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1249 (Related) 2015-03-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2389 (Related) 2015-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Income tax credits
Marriage and family status
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social security and elderly assistance
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Income tax credits
Marriage and family status
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social security and elderly assistance
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/686/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s686/BILLS-114s686is.pdf |